judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RODERICK L. MARSH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0982
Short Caption:RODERICK L. MARSH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Bail Reform Act
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8384-87Filed Date:07/29/1988

Opening Event Date:07/29/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/01/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRoderick L. Marsh N
Douglas J. WoodNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MARSH, RODERICK L. UNITED STATES
07/29/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/27/1988RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE SRT, DSA & FEE OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD DSA
11/09/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/09/1988ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 101088 SCHPRD DSA
11/09/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
12/01/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD