Case Information: 46734 | |||
Short Caption: | CROUSE VS. BILL HEARD CHEVROLET CORP. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A495211 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/14/2006 / Christensen, Thomas | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/19/2007 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/07/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Dixon Truman & Fisher--check no. 2255. | ||
02/07/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 06-02743 | |
02/14/2006 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas F. Christensen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/22/2006 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 06-03863 | |
03/01/2006 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 06-04634 | |
03/29/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 06-06606 | |
04/05/2006 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 06-07166 | |
04/21/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/19/05. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins. | 06-08486 | |
07/07/2006 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 06-14006 | |
07/07/2006 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 06-14007 | |
08/07/2006 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 06-16395 | |
08/07/2006 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 06-16396 | |
09/11/2006 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 06-18713 | |
01/09/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Transcript. To date, court recorder Jill Hawkins has not filed the requested transcript held on December 19, 2005. However, respondents included a copy of the transcript in the appendix to their answering brief. Ms. Hawkins is not obligated to file another copy of the transcript in this court. | 07-00633 | |
07/19/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the SNP Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 07-15718 | |
07/19/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. SNP07-mg/md/mc. | ||
09/25/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC. | 07-21225 | |
10/23/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-22176 | |
10/23/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/01/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 29, 2007. | 07-22176 |