judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KERI L. JACKSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0820
Short Caption:KERI L. JACKSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3068-86Filed Date:06/30/1988

Opening Event Date:06/30/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/13/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/25/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/13/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/05/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKeri L. Jackson N
Annie R. Alexander YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Mark J. Carroll YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JACKSON, KERI L. UNITED STATES
06/30/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/11/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANNIE ALEXANDER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 082988 SCHPRD R
06/13/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/13/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (14 PGS. -- SCHERTZER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
08/31/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 072489 SCHPRD BA
10/30/1989ORDER APLT BRIEF DUE W/IN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER JB PANELRO SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD U
11/29/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 112989 SCHPRD BA
12/26/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-28-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD BE
01/19/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/28/90. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD V
01/25/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-27-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 012890 SCHPRD BE
02/20/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/27/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD V
02/27/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 022790 SCHPRD BE
03/27/1990ORDER GRANT APLE MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE BR, BRIEF DUE W/IN 30 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELDDW SCDATE 031690 SCHPRD U
04/11/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(18 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 062790 SCHPRD RT
04/17/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (11 PGS. -- RHOADES) RJG PANEL SCDATE 062990 SCHPRD RT
05/25/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/25/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(6 PGS/GLEASON) AD PANEL SCDATE 062890 SCHPRD RT
03/13/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/13/1991SUBMITTED PANELBESCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1991DISMISSED MOJ DISMISSING APPEAL PANELBESCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/05/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD