judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHILAH K. HANEE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0909
Short Caption:SHILAH K. HANEE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6333-87Filed Date:07/14/1988

Opening Event Date:07/14/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/22/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/02/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/07/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/28/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantShilah K. Hanee N
Diane M. Bratter YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HANEE, SHILAH K. AKA HARRY L. DUDLEY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: RANDY L. BARRETT NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 10/18/88 ORD: DENY APLT'S MO NOTE - 02 TO REMAND W/O PREJUDICE TO ITS NOTE - 03 RENEWAL IN THE EVENT THE TRIAL NOTE - 03 COURT INDICATES ITS NOTE - 04 WILLINGNESS TO GRANT THE SUPR. NOTE - 04 CT. CRIM. R. 35 MOTION.
07/14/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/29/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DIANE BRATTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD DSA
09/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RT (106 PGS/BURNS) RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 091388 SCHPRD R
10/18/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 4 SL PANELPY SCDATE 101288 SCHPRD Q
09/15/1989ORDER APLT W/I 20 DAYS TO ADVISE THIS COURT RE STATUS OF PRO- CEEDING IN TRIAL COURT. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989STATEMENT STATUS PER 9-15-89 COURT ORDER AD PANEL SCDATE 100589 SCHPRD CHECK
11/22/1989FiledRecord Completed
11/22/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(140 PGS/TROUPE-TAPE) AD PANEL SCDATE 122689 SCHPRD RT
12/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-10-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD BA
02/09/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1990ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE BRF AND THE LODGED BRF IS HEREBY FILED AND APLE'S BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS PANELRBH SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD N
04/02/1990FiledBriefing Completed
04/02/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD BE
04/09/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(ORDER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1990RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT REQUESTING COPIES OF ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990LETTER REFERRING LTR FROM APLT TO COUNSEL SL PANELDDW SCDATE 042690 SCHPRD Q
09/07/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/07/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF APPELLANT'S CONVICTION PANELSWWGGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1990SUBMITTED PANELSWWGGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
09/28/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD