judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CALVIN C. JACKSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0908
Short Caption:CALVIN C. JACKSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 88-CF-0187 Consolidated:88-CF-0908
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6361-87Filed Date:07/14/1988

Opening Event Date:07/14/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/15/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/31/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/13/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/10/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCalvin C. Jackson N
Alfred J. Merlie YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas C. Black YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JACKSON, CALVIN C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: PATRICIA MOTON & NOTE - 01 TONYA BOYD NOTE - 02 CON 88-187 NOTE - 02
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/12/13 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GREENSPANR FOR - APLT MOTON ATTY 2 - BLACKTH FOR - APPELLEE
07/14/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/29/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALFRED J. MERLIE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD DSA
10/12/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 091388 SCHPRD R
02/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (54 PGS. -- HART) RJG PANEL SCDATE 083088 SCHPRD RT
02/13/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 032789 SCHPRD BA
05/16/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 12, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 042789 SCHPRD BE
05/19/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THIS APPEAL WITH 88-187 & TO REVISE THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO CONS 88-187 & 88- 908; BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS AFTR BRF OF APLT FL IN 88-187. PANELRO SCDATE 060689 SCHPRD Q
07/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT IN 88-187 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/27/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 062789 SCHPRD BA
07/27/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-187 JB PANEL SCDATE 072789 SCHPRD BA
08/31/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/31/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 083189 SCHPRD BE
11/20/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989ORDER ON BEHALF OF MERITS DIV. THAT APLT'S MO TO SUBMIT IS GRTD & CASE TO BE SUBM W/O ARG. SL PANELRBH SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD VS
12/13/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/13/1989ARGUED PANELFESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/10/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD