Case Information: 40921 | |||
Short Caption: | BOSWORTH (GARY) VS. STATE C/W 40922 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 40921*, 40922 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR021676 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Pretrial |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/11/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/11/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 03-02415 | |
04/09/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. fn1[Pursuant to NRAP 3(b), we consolidate these appeals.] "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED without prejudice to appellant's right to appeal from a final judgment of conviction." NNP03-RR/WM/MG. Nos. 40921/40922. | 03-05919 | |
05/06/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-06302 | |
05/06/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/12/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 7, 2003. | 03-06302 |