judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTONIO R. HARVEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0880
Short Caption:ANTONIO R. HARVEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-953-08Filed Date:07/15/2010

Opening Event Date:07/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/04/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/29/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/08/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/29/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAntonio R. Harvey Y
Paul J. RileyNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Michelle Parikh Brown YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/27/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/29/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (145 pgs/Geddes) 12/7/09 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (172 pgs/White) 12/8/09 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (250 pgs/White) 12/9/09 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (202 pgs/White) 12/10/09 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (180 pgs/Burr) 12/14/09 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (238 pgs/Burr) 12/15-17/09 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (35 pgs/Kaczorowski) 6/17/10 proc.
10/04/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/08/2010RECORD INDEX
10/08/2010RECORD COPIES
10/08/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (SEALED documents)
11/15/2010COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS and appoint new cancel Granted
11/30/2010ORDERED that the motion of counsel for appellant is granted and the appointment of James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby vacated, and David Reiter, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. James W. Klein, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. F/O that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 90 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW)
01/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (unopposed)
01/28/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 30, 2011. (JAC)
05/25/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/25/2011APPENDIX
06/24/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
07/06/2011 On consideration of appellee's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before July 29, 2011. (Castillo)
07/29/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/29/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/16/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/06/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/16/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/08/2012FiledArgued before Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Thompson, and Ferren
08/07/2012FiledAffirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
08/20/2012FiledMotion for appointment to file writ of certiotari (Appellant)Granted
08/20/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
08/29/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for appointment to file writ of certiotari (Appellant) and Paul Riley, Esquire, is appointed.
08/29/2012FiledAppointing Counsel/CJA Paul J. Riley, Esquire (Appellant)
08/29/2012FiledMandate
01/16/2013FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)