judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

E. H. PERRY, ET AL. v. LIPSCOMB COUNTY, TEXAS, ET AL.

Case: A-13
A-13
01/04/1944
Application for Writ of Error
E. H. PERRY, ET AL.
LIPSCOMB COUNTY, TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/19/1944Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/27/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/25/1944Response to Brief filedPetitioner
02/21/1944Response to Reply filedRespondent
02/15/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/12/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/19/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/17/1944Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
01/14/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
01/04/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/29/1944Letter Filed
05/19/1944Reply to Response
05/09/1944Response to Motion filed
04/27/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/26/1944Motion to Argue filed
02/25/1944Response to Brief filed
02/21/1944Response to Reply filed
02/16/1944Additional Copies received
02/15/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/12/1944Reply to Response
01/21/1944Bond
01/20/1944Motion to re-set submission date filed.Filing granted
01/19/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/19/1944Document received (See Remarks)
01/19/1944Document received (See Remarks)
01/19/1944Document received (See Remarks)
01/17/1944Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
01/14/1944Response to Petition
01/04/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/04/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lipscomb County, Texas, et al.Respondent
E. H. Perry, et al.Petitioner
Ben H. PowellAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information