judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD D. STAMPS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0834
Short Caption:RONALD D. STAMPS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8123-87Filed Date:06/24/1988

Opening Event Date:06/24/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/13/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/26/1989
Argued/Submitted:10/24/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/21/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Douglas J. WoodYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Oscar S. Mayers YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STAMPS, RONALD D. UNITED STATES
06/24/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/10/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA, SRT & FEE OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 070588 SCHPRD DR
08/19/1988DESIGNATION OF RECORD MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/19/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD DSA
08/19/1988$50.00 DOCKETING FEE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/19/1988STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RT(13 PGS/RUST) (33 PGS/MOLLICHELLI) AD PANEL SCDATE 101888 SCHPRD R
11/21/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR EXTEN- SION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/22/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 22ND JB PANEL SCDATE 112288 SCHPRD BA
01/05/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. PB PANELRO SCDATE 121488 SCHPRD V
01/13/1989FiledRecord Completed
01/13/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 011689 SCHPRD BA
02/28/1989ORDER DIRG APLE, W/IN 10 DAYS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE SCHD ON REC AND BA ALONE.FH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1989APPELLEE'S REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE & REQU- EST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD ANSE
04/05/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/26/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE FOR CONSID AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD OPA
10/24/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/24/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGTERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF ORDER REVOKING APLT's PROBATION PANELRGTERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/21/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD