judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RODRIGUES (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46745
Short Caption:RODRIGUES (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 51224 , 51328 , 52398 , 52513
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR051593Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/22/2007How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/07/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/07/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-02778
02/07/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 06-02779
02/23/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to appoint counsel for appellant. Within 5 days from the date of appointment, the district court clerk shall transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order appointing appellate counsel. To the extent that appellant is seeking permission to represent himself in this appeal, this court denies the request. This court declines to permit appellant leave to file proper person documents. Appellant shall proceed by and through his appointed counsel. 06-04023
03/08/2006Other Returned Mail. Receipt for documents dated 01/21/06 addressed to David Rodrigues remailed to corrected address.
03/09/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Washoe County Public Defender. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-05194
03/17/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On February 23, 2006, this court entered an order remanding this matter to the district court to appoint counsel for appellant. The February 21, 2006 proper person motion seeking appointment of counsel is denied as moot. 06-05753
03/20/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-05910
03/20/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: November 7(2), 8, and 9(2), 2005. To Court Reporter: Peggy Hoogs, Denise Phipps, Lori Urmston, and Millie Terry Hoenshell. 06-05911
04/20/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 11/07/05, 11/08/05, and 11/09/05. Court Reporter: Peggy Hoogs, Lori Urmston, and Millie Hoenshell. 06-08421
06/21/2006MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Appointment of Effective Assistant of Counsel. RETURNED, UNFILED, PER 9/20/06 ORDER. 06-12913
07/07/2006MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 7, 2006. 06-14038
07/17/2006MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Submette. RETURNED, UNFILED, PER 9/20/06 ORDER. 06-14832
08/03/2006MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 32 pages. 06-16126
08/03/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-16128
08/03/2006AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 06-16129
08/03/2006MotionFiled Motion. Motion Requesting the Court to Direct the Clerk of the Second Judicial District Court to Forward the Presentence Investigation Report Contained in the Confidential Envelope in CR05-1593. 06-16130
09/06/2006MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: October 6, 2006. 06-18396
09/20/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. In light of our previous order, we direct the clerk to return, unfiled, the proper person documents submitted on June 21, 2006, and July 17, 2006. The clerk shall return, unfiled, any future proper person documents submitted for filing. We grant counsel's 8/3/06 motion. Within 20 days from the date of this order, the district court clerk shall forward a certified copy of the presentence investigation report, in a sealed envelope, for filing and consideration with the appendix. 06-19369
09/20/2006Other Returned Unfiled Document. Motion for Appointment of Effective Assistant of Counsel. 06-12913
09/20/2006Other Returned Unfiled Document. Motion to Submette. 06-14832
09/27/2006Other Other. Received copy of PSI Report from Washoe county Clerk. -SEALED- 06-19787
10/10/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-20742
11/13/2006MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 8, 2006. 06-23147
12/05/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. 06-24826
01/22/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 07-01536
01/22/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/08/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC 07-05568
04/03/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-07152
04/03/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/12/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 4, 2007. 07-07152
04/20/2007Other Returned Unfiled Document. Original document entitled, "Motion to Reconsider."