judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEWIS L. TURNER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0832
Short Caption:LEWIS L. TURNER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13636-87Filed Date:06/30/1988

Opening Event Date:06/30/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/16/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLewis L. Turner N
Thomas K. Clancy NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TURNER, LEWIS L. UNITED STATES
06/30/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/19/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS K. CLANCY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 072988 SCHPRD DSA
08/23/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/26/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
08/26/1988ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELPY SCDATE 082488 SCHPRD V
08/26/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
09/16/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD