judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

QUENTIN MCLEAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0823
Short Caption:QUENTIN MCLEAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9655-87Filed Date:06/28/1988

Opening Event Date:06/28/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/19/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/09/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/22/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
David Carey WollYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCLEAN, QUENTIN UNITED STATES
06/28/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/19/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID CAREY WOLL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/26/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 072988 SCHPRD DSA
09/01/1988LETTER PRO SE FROM APLT REQUESTING STATUS OF CASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 082988 SCHPRD R
09/26/1988RECEIVED COPY OF APPELLANT'S PRO SE MO- TION FOR STAY OF APPEAL MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 5/31/88 RT FROM CT RPTR HAWKINS. EBP PANEL SCDATE 121088 SCHPRD RT
10/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(9 PGS/TAPE) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO LETTER DATED 9/28/88 MLR PANEL SCDATE 101088 SCHPRD ANSA
10/26/1988RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APLT RE: COMPLAINT AGAINST DAVID WOLL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 11/11/88 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE, RE COURT-AP- POINTED ATTORNEY MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (124 PGS RT - WRAY) GT PANEL SCDATE 083188 SCHPRD RT
01/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
03/22/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(14 PGS/HAWKINS) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
04/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-19-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 042189 SCHPRD BE
05/10/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/19/89. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD M
05/15/1989RECEIVED LETTER DATED 8/31/88, FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1989FiledBriefing Completed
05/19/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 051989 SCHPRD BE
08/16/1989RECEIVED LETTER FROM MCLEAN RE CASE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/09/1989SUBMITTED PANELFESTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/22/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD