judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NATHAN O. BOWMAN, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0835
Short Caption:NATHAN O. BOWMAN, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Lead:88-CF-0835Consolidated: 91-CO-1488
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1561-88Filed Date:06/22/1988

Opening Event Date:06/22/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/03/1992Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/07/1994
Argued/Submitted:04/20/1994
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/23/1995

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNathan O. Bowman, Jr.N
Frances M. D'Antuono YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Douglas F. GanslerYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BOWMAN JR., NATHAN O. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902FOR RT
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 101789 ORD: DENY MO FOR STAY NOTE - 01 W/O PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL UPON NOTE - 02 INDICATION BY TRIAL JUDGE THAT NOTE - 02 HE IS DISPOSED TO GRANT RELIEF NOTE - 03 SOUGHT; FO APLT BRF DUE IN NOTE - 03 40 DAYS. NOTE - 04 08/24/90 ORD: GRANTG APLT'S MO NOTE - 04 TO STAY & APPEAL IS HEREBY NOTE - 05 STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER NOTE - 05 OF THIS CRT; F/O COUNS FOR NOTE - 06 APLT TO ADVISE THIS COURT W/IN NOTE - 06 30 DAYS AS TO THE STATUS OF NOTE - 07 PENDING MO FILED IN TRL CRT NOTE - 07 PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE 23-110. NOTE - 08 12/13/91 ORD: APLT TO ADVISE NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 THIS CRT W/IN 10 DYS FRM DT NOTE - 09 OF THIS ORDER AS TO THE STATUS NOTE - 10 OF PENDING MOTION FLD IN TRL NOTE - 10 CRT PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE NOTE - 11 23-110. FAILURE TO SO MAY NOTE - 11 RESULT IN HER APPOINTMENT NOTE - 12 BEING VACATED & HER NAME NOTE - 12 BEING REMOVED FRM PANEL OF NOTE - 13 ATTYS AUTHORIZED TO RECEIVE NOTE - 13 APPOINTMENTS UNDER THE NOTE - 14 CRIMINAL JUSTICE ACT. NOTE - 14 NOTE - 15 CONS. 91-1488 & 88-835 NOTE - 15
06/22/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/19/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) FRANCES M. D'ANTUONO, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 072988 SCHPRD DSA
08/24/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (18 PGS RT - SWAGERTY) GT PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD R
07/18/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO EXT TM TO COMPLETE RT; RT DUE 7/31/89. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 110588 SCHPRD RT
08/10/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(265 PGS/WATKINS) AD PANEL SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD RT
09/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY & FOR REMAND TO THE TRIAL CT FOR HEARING ON APLT'S MOTION TO VACATE SENTENCE GT PANEL SCDATE 091989 SCHPRD BA
10/17/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD Q
11/27/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR ADDITIONAL TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 112689 SCHPRD BA
12/27/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR FOR A PERIOD OF 40 DAYS AFTER RT OF 4/18/89 PROC FLD. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (11 PGS. -- WATKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 011790 SCHPRD CHECK
06/26/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 5, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 062690 SCHPRD BA
07/18/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 08-05-90. NFX GR PANELFF SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD GR
08/06/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 THUR 07 GW PANELRO SCDATE 082190 SCHPRD V
09/24/1990STATEMENT STATUS OF PENDING MOTION IN TRL COURT AJ PANEL SCDATE 092490 SCHPRD CHECK
11/13/1990ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO ADVISE THIS CRT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDG MO FL IN TRL CRT. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 110190 SCHPRD V
04/25/1991ORDER DIR. APLT TO FILE STATUS STATE OF PENDING MO FLD IN TR CT W/IN 10 DAYS OR REF BAR. AD PANELRO SCDATE 042291 SCHPRD V
05/06/1991APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 4/25/91 ORDER AJ PANEL SCDATE 050691 SCHPRD ANSA
05/30/1991ORDER APLT TO ADVISE CT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDING 23-110 . AD PANELRBH SCDATE 052891 SCHPRD K
06/24/1991STATEMENT RE STATUS OF APLT 23 D.C. CODE SEC 110 MOTION PMB PANEL SCDATE 070191 SCHPRD ANSA
07/30/1991ORDER APLT TO ADVISE CT W/IN 30 DAYS RE STATUS OF 23-110. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 072691 SCHPRD K
08/30/1991STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION RJG PANEL SCDATE 082991 SCHPRD STATE
10/28/1991ORDER APLT CNSL TO ADVISE THIS CRT W/IN 30 DYS FRM DT OF ORDER AS TO STATUS OF PENDING MOTION. PANELRBH SCDATE 100891 SCHPRD GR
12/13/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 08 - 14 GR PANELJWR SCDATE 120491 SCHPRD GR
12/19/1991STATEMENT OF APLT STATUS OF PENDING AJ PANEL SCDATE 122391 SCHPRD STATE
01/14/1992ORDER FRANCE D'ANTUONO ESQ IS APPT. IN 91-1488. DSA IN 91-1488 DUE IN 10. 88-835 & 91-1488 CONS. PANELRO SCDATE 123091 SCHPRD CHECK
02/27/1992RECORD ON APPEAL IN 91-1488 PANEL SCDATE 022792 SCHPRD R
04/02/1992COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT Jones - 12-19-92 proceedings
04/09/1992The brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. Any requests for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only in extraordinary circumstances. (By JEP)
05/04/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (154 pgs. -- Franklin) (12/16/91 proceedings).
05/18/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 40 days after completion or rt's
06/26/1992ORD DENY APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF Brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days. nfx.
08/05/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 40 days
08/31/1992ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEFto 40 days after complete rt is filed.
09/11/1992COURT REPORTER MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FL TRANSCRIPT of 12/17/91 proc. to 11/30/92. (crt rptr Jones)
11/03/1992RECORD COMPLETED
11/03/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (173 pgs. -- Jones) (12/17/91 proceedings).
11/23/1992ORD GRT CRT REPORTER MO TO EXT TM TO FL TRANSCRIPT of trial proc. to 11/30/92. (crt rptr Jones)
03/24/1993ORDER: The brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. Any requests for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only in extraordinary circumstances. (By WHN)
05/03/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until 6/4/93.
05/26/1993ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEFand the brief of appellant shall be on before June 4, 1993. Any further request for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only in extraordinary circumstances. (By RO)
06/07/1993APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to late file mot. for enlargement of time to file aplt's brief
06/07/1993RECEIVED - MAXB
06/14/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 6/21/93
06/17/1993SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (pleadings & orders filed in superior court)
06/18/1993APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD and to enlarge the time for filing appellant's brief until the record on appeal is complete.
07/26/1993ORD GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD (by: NG)
07/26/1993ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to the extent that the brief fo appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. (by: NG)
10/20/1993ORDER - ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the brief out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply may result in counsel's appointment being vacated. (By WHN0
11/09/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
11/09/1993RECEIVED appellant's brief.
11/09/1993APLT MO FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGES
11/15/1993TMC - appellant's motion for leave to exceed page limit - appellant's motion for leave to file brief
12/08/1993APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until 1/7/94. (no oppo.)
12/15/1993ORD GRT APLT MO FOR LV TO FL BRF IN EXCESS OF PGS and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief. (by: STSCMK)
12/15/1993APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/15/1993ORD GRANT APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the brief of appellee shall be filed on or before January 7, 1994. (by: STSCMK)
01/07/1994APPELLEE'S BRIEF
01/07/1994BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/24/1994FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
04/20/1994FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/20/1994ARGUED (TE,SC,WG) Frances M. D'Antuono, Esquire, for appellant. Douglas F. Gansler, Esquire, for appellee.
12/30/1994AFFIRMED Opinion
01/23/1995MANDATE ISSUED