Case Information: 46715 | |||
Short Caption: | PIPER (PERRION) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43887 , 44371 , 46841 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C197700 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/03/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/03/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 06-02550 | |
02/15/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 06-03312 | |
03/07/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH | 06-04944 | |
04/04/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-05084 | |
04/04/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/17/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 10, 2006. | 06-05084 |