Case Information: 46709 | |||
Short Caption: | RICE (PAUL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 46317 , 48617 , 52857 , 53828 , 57328 , 60064 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CR0504953 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/01/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/01/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 06-02327 | |
02/14/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 06-03274 | |
02/16/2006 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Amended Certificate of Service to Certificate Regarding Transcript Request. | 06-03476 | |
02/24/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The deadlines for the filing of documents in this appeal pursuant to NRAP 3C are hereby suspended until further order of this court. | 06-04111 | |
04/10/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH | 06-07481 | |
05/05/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-07684 | |
05/05/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/10/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 8, 2006. | 06-07684 |