judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FOTOS, CHRIS FIREMAN'S INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Information: 86-CV-0260
Short Caption:FOTOS, CHRIS FIREMAN'S INSURANCE COMPANYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA7785-84Filed Date:02/07/1986

Opening Event Date:02/07/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/29/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/15/1987
Argued/Submitted:05/21/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Charles H. Acker, IIIYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
George H. Eggers YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FOTOS, CHRIS FIREMAN'S INSURANCE COMPANY OF WASHINGTON D.C.
02/07/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/29/1986FiledRecord Completed
01/15/1987FiledBriefing Completed
05/21/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/30/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition