judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALLEN R. DAVIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0803
Short Caption:ALLEN R. DAVIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8983-85Filed Date:12/12/1986

Opening Event Date:12/12/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/13/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/13/1989
Argued/Submitted:03/19/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/11/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAllen R. Davis N
John A. Briley, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
William J. Hochul YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DAVIS, ALLEN R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: GLENN EARLY & ALDORIA NOTE - 01 MCCLAIN
12/12/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/11/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN A. BRILEY, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD DSA
02/13/1989FiledRecord Completed
02/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(338 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD RT
02/14/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-8-89 (NO OPP0) AD PANEL SCDATE 032789 SCHPRD BA
04/12/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR EXT OF TIME TO FILE BRF ON OR BEFORE 5/8/89 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD CHECK
05/08/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 8, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD BA
05/10/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/8/89; NFX. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD M
06/08/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 060889 SCHPRD BA
07/10/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 9TH (NO OPA) JB PANEL SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD BE
07/17/1989ORDER GRT APLE'S MOTION FOR AN EXT OF TIME TO FILE BRF TO 8/9/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/09/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 8TH (NO OPA) JB PANEL SCDATE 080989 SCHPRD BE
08/11/1989ORDER GRT APLE'S MOTION FOR AN EXT OF TIME TO FILE BRF TO 9/8/89. PB PANEL SCDATE 081089 SCHPRD V
09/08/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 22, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 090889 SCHPRD BE
09/21/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1989FiledBriefing Completed
11/13/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 110889 SCHPRD M
03/19/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/19/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGNWKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/20/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELRGNWKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/20/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/11/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD