judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY J. THOMAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0783
Short Caption:ANTHONY J. THOMAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8488-87Filed Date:06/16/1988

Opening Event Date:06/16/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/15/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/09/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/22/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony J. Thomas N
William Michael Whelan NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Michael A. Stern YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Robert C. Little YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901THOMAS, ANTHONY J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/7/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF WILLIAM M. WHELAN & APPT NOTE - 02 MICHAEL A. STERN FOR APLT; BRF NOTE - 03 OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 03
01/01/1906 WHELANW VACATED 4/7/89.
06/16/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/06/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM M. WHELAN, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DS TO 7/28/88 MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD DSA
07/28/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1988RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD R
01/11/1989RECEIVED LETTER FROM JUDGE BURGESS IN RE: ATTY'S REQUEST FOR AN OTSC ON COURT REPORTER RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1989FiledRecord Completed
03/15/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(296 PGS/GRAYBILL) AD PANEL SCDATE 031989 SCHPRD RT
03/28/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT (WM. MICHAEL WHELAN JR.) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL A. STERN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 040489 SCHPRD GG
05/10/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 051789 SCHPRD BA
06/06/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 061489 SCHPRD BE
06/27/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/12/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 061989 SCHPRD OPA
07/11/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-2-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 071289 SCHPRD BE
07/17/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/9/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 071289 SCHPRD M
08/09/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/09/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 080989 SCHPRD BE
01/22/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/22/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWFEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWFEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD