judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MELVIN HUGHES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0777
Short Caption:MELVIN HUGHES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 88-CF-0299 Consolidated:88-CF-0777
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12423-87Filed Date:05/25/1988

Opening Event Date:05/25/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/06/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/27/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/18/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMelvin Hughes N
Allan Levin YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kathleen Brandon YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HUGHES, MELVIN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 072788 ORDER: SS, CONS 88-299 NOTE - 01 & 88-777; FO: DSA IN 88-777 NOTE - 02 DUE IN 10 DAYS; FO: CONS BR OF NOTE - 02 APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTR REC & RT NOTE - 03 FILED IN 88-777. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 CON 88-299 NOTE - 04
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/09/27 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LEVINAL FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BRANDONK FOR - APPELLEE
05/25/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/06/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALLAN LEVIN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1988RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD R
08/04/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD DSA
10/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (69 PGS/WATKINS) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/11/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/29/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 3/14/88 RT FROM CT RPTR WATKINS. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-2-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD BE
02/01/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 7TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 3/7/89. ANY FUR REQ W/BE DISFAVORED BY THE CT. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD CHECK
03/07/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 6, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 030789 SCHPRD BE
03/14/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 4/6/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 031789 SCHPRD CHECK
04/06/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/06/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 040689 SCHPRD BE
04/19/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/27/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELBESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1989ARGUED PANELBESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/18/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD