judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH A. SMITH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0776
Short Caption:JOSEPH A. SMITH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9618-87Filed Date:06/20/1988

Opening Event Date:06/20/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/11/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/09/1991
Argued/Submitted:09/16/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoseph A. Smith N
James W. KleinNY
S. Pamela Thomas Gray YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Teresa A. Howie YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SMITH, JOSEPH A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/09/16 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - THOMASSP FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - HOWIET FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 THOMASSP ORD: 9/13/91 PRO HAC VICE
06/20/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/30/1988RECEIVED NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED BY APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 071588 SCHPRD DSA
08/24/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (106 PGS RT - RUST) GT PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD R
06/19/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (11 PGS RT - SCHERTZER) GT PANEL SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD RT
06/23/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(304 PGS/HOLLAND) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING RECORD ON APPEAL (SUPPLEMENTAL) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1989ORDER APLT TO FL BRF IN 40 DAYS. (RT ORDER CANCELLED) ACG PANELRO SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD CHECK
09/11/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER RECEIPT & COM- PLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 092789 SCHPRD BA
12/01/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING BA FOR PERIOD OF 40 DAYS FROM DATE RT OF 4/4/89 PROC DOCKETED. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(61 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(ORDER JUDGE URBINA DATED 12-12-89 ) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1991RECORD COMPLETED
02/07/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7 DAYS (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 031491 SCHPRD BE
03/21/1991RECEIVED APPEELLES BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1991ORDER GRANTG APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & BRF IS FL; CASE SCHD BEFORE A MERTS DIV ASAP. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 032891 SCHPRD V
04/09/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/03/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (270 PGS/HART) PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/20/1991CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/26/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF S. PAMELA THOMAS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR THE APPELLANT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1991MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 28(K) CITE FROM APLE DATED 5/16 TO DIVISION. KHO PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1991LETTER GRANT APLT'S RQST TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT. CT PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/27/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/27/1991RECEIVED APLT'S REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1991ORDER GRT APLT'S MOT TO FLE REPLY BRF,LODGED REPLY BRF IS FILED KHO PANELRBH SCDATE 090591 SCHPRD O
09/05/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF KHO PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/09/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF S. PAMELA THOMAS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR APPELLANT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1991ORDER GRANT MOT OF S. PAMELA THOMAS, ESQ., TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE ON 9/16/91 AT 1:30 PM. MEH PANELFEWANW SCDATE 091091 SCHPRD VS
09/16/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/16/1991ARGUED PANELFEWGNW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/24/1991CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 OF APLE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1991MEMORANDUM TRANMITTING MEMO CIRCULATING COUNSEL FOR APLE'S CITE 28(K) KHO PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1992AFFIRMED IN PART/REVERSED IN PART JUDGMENT AF/RV IN PART TRIAL COURT JUDGMENT...CAUSE RM FOR RESENTENCING PANELFEWGNW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRV METH -OPN JUDGE -NW 601 A.2d 1080
01/24/1992OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - NW PAGE # - 0243
01/24/1992AFFIRMED IN PART/REVERSED IN PART
02/14/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD