judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROY S. WARE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0785
Short Caption:ROY S. WARE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F364-87Filed Date:06/15/1988

Opening Event Date:06/15/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/28/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/20/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRoy S. Ware N
Alfred J. Merlie YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Per A. Ramfjord YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WARE, ROY S. UNITED STATES
06/15/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/06/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALFRED J. MERLIE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD DSA
08/30/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC)AD PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD R
11/11/1988FiledRecord Completed
12/13/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(502 PGS/TOOBY) AD PANEL SCDATE 113088 SCHPRD RT
01/19/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR A 30 DAY EXTENSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD BA
01/26/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 2/22/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD V
02/22/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 022289 SCHPRD BA
03/21/1989APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1989FiledBriefing Completed
03/28/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 032889 SCHPRD BE
04/24/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD W/ATTACHED GOV. EXH. 9 PB PANEL SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD Q
09/20/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/20/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/12/1989RECEIVED NOTICE OF ABANDONMENT OF APPELLANT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1990ORDER DENY APPELLANT'S PRO SE MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE. MEH PANELNWTEPY SCDATE 122089 SCHPRD VS