judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY D. GUDGER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0784
Short Caption:ANTHONY D. GUDGER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 87-CF-0859 Consolidated:88-CF-0784
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1231-87Filed Date:06/17/1988

Opening Event Date:06/17/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/22/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/17/1989
Argued/Submitted:07/19/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/03/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony D. Gudger N
Sumner J. Katz YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Robert A. Spelke YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GUDGER, ANTHONY D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 87-859 NOTE - 01
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/07/19 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KATZS FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SPELKER FOR - APPELLEE
06/17/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/06/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SUMNER KATZ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD DSA
07/26/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 87-859 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/22/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD R
09/12/1988ORDER GRANT MO TO CONS 87-859 & 88- 784; CONS BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 081188 SCHPRD CHECK
10/24/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 102488 SCHPRD BA
11/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-29-88 (NO OPPO) AD PB PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD BE
12/28/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 29, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 122988 SCHPRD BE
02/02/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1989FiledBriefing Completed
02/17/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD V
02/21/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1989LETTER GRANTING REQ OF APLT FOR ARG ON SUM CAL OF 7/19/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 051689 SCHPRD OPE
07/19/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/19/1989ARGUED PANELMKSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELMKSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/03/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD