Case Information: 46726 | |||
Short Caption: | BARTSAS VS. CITY OF LAS VEGAS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 47185 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A436859 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Rose | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/09/2006 / Buchanan, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/07/2006 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Rose. | ||
02/07/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kermitt L. Waters--check no. 1206. | ||
02/07/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 06-02689 | |
02/09/2006 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/23/2006 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 06-03969 | |
04/17/2006 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 12/12/05; 12/13/05; 12/14/05; and 12/15/05. Court Reporter: Cheryl Gardner. | 06-08056 | |
05/01/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Status Report (Appellants will be sending a motion to dismiss.) | 06-09109 | |
05/11/2006 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Mark A. Hutchison has associated with James J. Leavitt. | 06-09929 | |
05/17/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Due: 15 days. Failure to comply with this order may result in this appeal being dismissed as abandoned. | 06-10393 | |
05/26/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal. | 06-11201 | |
06/12/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 14 2006. Nos. 46726/47185-cases are not consolidated. | 06-12255 | |
07/03/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. Nos. 46726/47185-cases are not consolidated. | 06-13729 | |
07/21/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 46726/47185-cases are not consolidated. | 06-15227 | |
07/21/2006 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Nos. 46726/47185-cases are not consolidated. | 06-15229 | |
07/21/2006 | Settlement Agreement | Filed Settlement Agreement. Nos. 46726/47185-cases are not consolidated. | 06-15231 | |
08/09/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). fn1[In light of this order, the May 26, 2006, Motion to Dismiss Appeal is denied as moot.] NNP/CLK | 06-16505 | |
08/09/2006 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |