judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALPHER, ELLIOTT J. LANGE, JUDITH

Case Information: 86-CV-0325
Short Caption:ALPHER, ELLIOTT J. LANGE, JUDITHClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA3314-83Filed Date:02/18/1986

Opening Event Date:02/18/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/18/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/27/1986
Argued/Submitted:09/29/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Margaret A. Beller YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Roy L. KaufmannYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ALPHER, ELLIOTT J. LANGE, JUDITH
02/18/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/18/1986FiledRecord Completed
06/27/1986FiledBriefing Completed
09/29/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/09/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition