judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ORNOFF, LYNNE H. KUHN AND KOGAN CHARTERED

Case Information: 86-CV-0316
Short Caption:ORNOFF, LYNNE H. KUHN AND KOGAN CHARTEREDClassification:Appeals - Civil - Torts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA10794-83Filed Date:11/16/1985

Opening Event Date:11/16/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/14/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/22/1988
Argued/Submitted:06/28/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/16/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Gerald H. Cohen NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Lois R. GoodmanYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Leo A. Roth YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Gilbert L. Sussman NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ORNOFF, LYNNE H. KUHN AND KOGAN CHARTERED
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/19/87 ORD: DENY MO OF APLE NOTE - 01 TO DISMISS; BRF OF APLT DUE 40 NOTE - 02 DAYS AFTER RT HAS BEEN FILED NOTE - 02 IN THIS CRT & BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 03 30 DAYS AFTER BRF OF APLT HAS NOTE - 03 BEEN FILED IN THIS COURT. NOTE - 04 011988 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 04 FOR LV TO FILE BR, CLK TO FILE NOTE - 05 LDGD APLT BR; FO: GRANT APLE NOTE - 05 MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 1/22. NOTE - 06 031489 ORD: REJECTING APLES NOTE - 06 OBJECTION BASED ON TIMELINESS; NOTE - 07 GRANT APLT REQUEST FOR COSTS NOTE - 07 W/RESPECT TO FILING FEE IN THE NOTE - 08 AMOUNT OF $50. & DENY W/RESPCT NOTE - 08 TO RT W/O PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL NOTE - 09 IN THE TRIAL CRT. NOTE - 09
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/06/28 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GOODMANL FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - ROTHL FOR - APPELLEE
11/16/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/10/1986ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS OTSC WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED. (NO CAS & FEE) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 120285 SCHPRD CAS
06/11/1986RECEIVED APLT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/11/1986RECEIVED CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1986MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1986APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER GG PANEL SCDATE 062086 SCHPRD ANSA
06/20/1986APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 062386 SCHPRD OPE
07/01/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1986ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO FILE CAS; CLK TO FILE LDGD CAS; NO 7A; APLT TO FILE DR/SRT IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 070186 SCHPRD CHECK
07/07/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD GG PANEL SCDATE 071186 SCHPRD DR
07/25/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (DEPOSITIONS) (1 LARGE BROWN ENVELOPE OF EXHIBITS) (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 090286 SCHPRD R
03/23/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1987APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 040187 SCHPRD OPA
06/19/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 040687 SCHPRD CHECK
07/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (403 PGS. - HUNT) PM PANEL SCDATE 072987 SCHPRD RT
07/14/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/14/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS GG PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD BA
10/02/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF OF APLT DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD OPE
11/04/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOV. 12TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD BE
11/16/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN 22ND (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 - 05. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 112687 SCHPRD CHECK
01/22/1988FiledBriefing Completed
01/22/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 012288 SCHPRD BE
06/28/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/28/1988ARGUED PANELPYMKNW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO CITE RECENTLY DECIDED CASE GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1988MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 7/25/88 MO TO CITE RECENT DECISION TO DIV. DAS PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1988REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV JUDGMENT ON APPEAL /CAUSE RM FOR A NEW TRIAL PANELMKNWPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE 549 A.2d 728
11/04/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 2346
11/17/1988REVERSED AND REMANDED (APPELLEE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR COSTS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S BILL OF COSTS JB PANEL SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD OPE
12/07/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO APLT'S BILL OF COSTS JB PANEL SCDATE 120888 SCHPRD CHECK
12/09/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY TO APLE'S OBJECTION TO BILL FOR COSTS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-09 ACG PANELMKNWPY SCDATE 010689 SCHPRD VS