judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS (DANNY) VS. STATE C/W 34777

Case Information: 34776
Short Caption:WILLIAMS (DANNY) VS. STATE C/W 34777Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:34776*, 34777 Related Case(s): 42668
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR990551Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08353
09/24/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Mary Pat Barry shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-09123
09/29/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to be Relieved as Counsel on Appeal and Motion, Pursuant to NRAP 2, for Suspension of Filing Deadlines Pending this Court's Ruling on the Motion. 99-09310
10/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. If Barry was relieved by the district court of her obligations and Oakes substituted in, the public defender's office must provide certified copies of district court documents showing as much. Until such showing, it appears that appellant was represented by the public defender's office in the district court. The public defender's office is ordered to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 30 days of this order. 99-10474
11/19/1999MotionFiled Motion. Supplemental Motion to be Relived as Counsel on Appeal and Second Motion, Pursuant to NRAP 2, for Suspension of Filing Deadlines Pending this Court's Ruling on the Supplemental Motion. 99-11538
12/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The public defender's motion to withdraw is granted, and the public defender's office is relieved of any further obligation in relation to this appeal. John Oakes is order to comply with NRAP 3C and, within 10 days of this order, file a transcript request form or a certificate stateing that no transcript is required and shall file a fast track statement within 40 days of this order. 99-12748
01/07/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. July 7, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Wendy L. Pearson (nos. 34776 & 34777). 00-00310
01/12/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. August 25, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Gail West-Willsey (nos. 34776 & 34777). 00-00540
01/19/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Request for Extension of Time in Which to File Appeal. 00-00851
02/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Oakes shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file the fast track statement. 00-01711
02/22/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-02794
02/29/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 25, 1999. Court Reporter: Debora L. Cecere. (Transcript filed in no. 34776.) 00-03184
04/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed within 10 days of this order. No further extensions shall be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 00-05333
05/17/2000Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 00-08258
05/18/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-08333
05/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement provisionally submitted on May 17, 2000. 00-08902
05/26/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-08258
06/08/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-09676
06/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, counsel has not responded to our order of April 5, 2000 in Docket No. 34777. It appears from the fast track statement filed in Docket No. 34776, that counsel for appellant may believe that that fast track statement applies to both appeals. We note however, that Docket Nos. 34776 and 34777 have never been consolidated. Counsel for appellant shall, within 10 days of this order, either file a fast track statement in Docket No. 34777, or file a motion to consolidated the two appeals. Failure to respond to this court's order will result in the imposition of monetary santions. Nos. 34776, 34777. 00-10394
06/22/2000MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 34776 & 34777. 00-10667
06/30/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. Counsel for Appellant filed a motion to consolidate. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. Respondent shall filed a single fast track response within 20 days of this order (nos. 34776/34777). 00-11230
07/10/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. (Nos. 34776 and 34777). 00-11728
08/10/2000MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 34776/34777/34778. 00-13900
08/10/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order Imposing Sanctions. Nos. 34776/34777/34778. 00-13901
08/18/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML Nos. 34776, 34777. 00-14516
08/30/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 30, 2000, we entered an order granting appellant's motion to consolidate the appeals in Docket Number 34776 and Docket Number 34777. On August 8, 2000, we entered an order in Docket No. 34778 imposing sanctions on counsel for appellant, attorney John E. Oakes. On August 10, 2000, appellant filed a response to the order imposing sanctions. We vacate that portion of our order entered on August 8, 2000, imposing sanctions against attorney Oakes. Also on August 10, 2000, appellant filed a motion to consolidate the appeal in Docket Number 34778 with the previously consolidated appeals in Docket Numbers 34776 and 34777. No good cause appearing, we deny the motion to consolidate the appeal in Docket Number 34778 with the consolidated appeals in Docket Numbers 34776 and 34777. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix for the appeal in Docket Number 34778 within 30 days from the date of this order. Nos. 34776, 34777, 34778. 00-15229
09/13/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14705
09/13/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/13/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Clarification. Nos. 34776/34777/34778. 00-16132
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 14, 2000. 00-14705