judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CLARK T. DRAYTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0898
Short Caption:CLARK T. DRAYTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8876-87Filed Date:07/14/1988

Opening Event Date:07/14/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/14/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/30/1989
Argued/Submitted:03/14/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/11/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantClark T. Drayton N
Joseph M. Hillegas YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sharon M. Collins YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DRAYTON, CLARK T. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 073189 ORD: CRT-APTD COUNSEL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT IN 30 DAYS TO FL BRF NOTE - 02 OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APPTMENT NOTE - 02 SHOULD NOT BE VACATED & HIS NOTE - 03 NAME REMOVED FOR CJA ATTY NOTE - 03 PANEL COVERED BY CJA ACT.
07/14/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/04/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOSEPH M. HILLEGAS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD DSA
10/12/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 091288 SCHPRD R
03/14/1989FiledRecord Completed
03/14/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (19 PGS RT - FRANKLIN) GT PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
07/31/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 ACG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 083089 SCHPRD BA
09/28/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-30-89 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD BE
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/30/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD M
10/30/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/30/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD BE
03/14/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/14/1990SUBMITTED PANELFEBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/20/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL (CONCURRING STMT - J. FERREN) PANELFEBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/20/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/11/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD