judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES E. MATTHEWS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0894
Short Caption:JAMES E. MATTHEWS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8969-87Filed Date:07/13/1988

Opening Event Date:07/13/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/04/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/31/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/09/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/01/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames E. Matthews N
Peter N. MannYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
William J. Hochul YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MATTHEWS, JAMES E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 02/22/89 ORD: VACATED & NAME NOTE - 01 REMOVED FROM CJA PANEL. FVH
07/13/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/03/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER N. MANN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD DSA
10/04/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/04/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 091288 SCHPRD R
12/07/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE BR OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD BA
12/12/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE UNTIL ALL TRANSCRIPTS HAVE BEEN PREPARED JB PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD BA
01/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (532 PGS - ALLISON) JB PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD RT
01/30/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO EXTENT THAT THE BR IS DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 011089 SCHPRD M
02/22/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, ON OR BEF 3/3/89 TO FILE BA OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APTMT SHOULD NOT BE PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 30TH JB PANEL SCDATE 030689 SCHPRD BA
03/31/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1989ORDER GRT MO OF APLT TO FL BRF, CLK TO FL BRF, APLE'S BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD V
05/12/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-13-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 051289 SCHPRD BE
06/09/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/13/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 052289 SCHPRD CHECK
06/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/20/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 061389 SCHPRD BE
06/14/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/31/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 072589 SCHPRD M
01/09/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/09/1990SUBMITTED PANELFEBERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELFEBERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/01/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD