judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARVIN E. JONES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0836
Short Caption:MARVIN E. JONES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8013-87Filed Date:06/23/1988

Opening Event Date:06/23/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/27/1989
Argued/Submitted:07/12/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/08/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Reginald G. Addison YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JONES, MARVIN E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: TRAYONE V. FLEMMING, NOTE - 01 MAURICE JOHNSON, RONALD STAMPS NOTE - 02 & ADAM CHASE NOTE - 02
06/23/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/19/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) REGINALD G. ADDISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1988ORDER APLT'S DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072988 SCHPRD DSA
08/31/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) AD PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD R
08/31/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD DSA
09/01/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS JB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD CHECK
09/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(17 PGS/ SWARINGER) PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD RT
09/27/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO LV TO FL DSA, CLK TO FL DSA, APLT'S BRF DUE IN 40 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 092388 SCHPRD V
11/11/1988FiledRecord Completed
12/07/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE BR OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 110788 SCHPRD BA
12/30/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD BA
12/30/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD N
02/27/1989FiledBriefing Completed
02/27/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD BE
07/12/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/12/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGFESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGFESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/08/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD