judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY J. TAPER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0837
Short Caption:ANTHONY J. TAPER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12437-87Filed Date:06/23/1988

Opening Event Date:06/23/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/13/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/23/1989
Argued/Submitted:03/13/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/06/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony J. Taper N
Reginald G. Addison YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
George J. Lane YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TAPER, ANTHONY J. UNITED STATES
06/23/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/19/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) REGINALD G. ADDISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1988ORDER APLT DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072988 SCHPRD DSA
08/31/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) AD PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD R
08/31/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD DSA
09/01/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS JB PB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD CHECK
09/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1989FiledRecord Completed
02/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(259 PGS/RAMOS) AD PANEL SCDATE 123088 SCHPRD RT
02/14/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/25/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 032789 SCHPRD BA
04/24/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FL BRIEF TO 5/25/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD V
06/07/1989ORDER APLT TO FL BRF IN 20 DAYS OR CASE DISMISSED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 052589 SCHPRD BA
07/19/1989ORDER APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APPTMENT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED & REFER TO BPR. PANELRO SCDATE 062789 SCHPRD BA
07/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/10/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD BA
08/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-11-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MOTIONS FOR LV TO FL BRF; APLE'S BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 083089 SCHPRD M
10/02/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 12TH JB PANEL SCDATE 093089 SCHPRD BE
10/12/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/23/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD OPA
03/13/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/13/1990SUBMITTED RJG PANELROTEMK SCDATE 031390 SCHPRD CSUM
03/16/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELROTEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/06/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD