judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY W. MALCOM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0814
Short Caption:ANTHONY W. MALCOM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8714-87Filed Date:06/22/1988

Opening Event Date:06/22/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/24/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/23/1989
Argued/Submitted:07/07/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/02/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony W. Malcom N
William T. MorrisonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Bruce Delaplaine YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MALCOM, ANTHONY W. AKA ANTHONY W. MALCOLM UNITED STATES
06/22/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/15/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM T. MORRISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS TIME HAVING EXPIRED (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD DSA
08/01/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 080388 SCHPRD V
08/24/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/24/1988RECORD ON APPEAL ADD PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD R
09/07/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (475 PGS. -- WHALEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 083188 SCHPRD RT
10/13/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD BA
11/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 19, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 111788 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 18, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD BE
12/30/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/18/89; NFX. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 122988 SCHPRD CHECK
01/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 17TH JB PANEL SCDATE 011889 SCHPRD BE
01/25/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MXBE AD PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD OPA
02/17/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1989FiledBriefing Completed
02/23/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF, CLK TO FL BRF, AND SCHD CASE ASAP. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 020689 SCHPRD CHECK
07/07/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/07/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGNWSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELRGNWSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/02/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD