judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYRONE BRISCOE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0826
Short Caption:TYRONE BRISCOE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6513-78Filed Date:06/27/1988

Opening Event Date:06/27/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/14/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/24/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/21/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/26/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Gregory E. Jackson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BRISCOE, TYRONE UNITED STATES
06/27/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/19/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER H. MEYERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 072988 SCHPRD DSA
09/14/1988FiledRecord Completed
09/14/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 082688 SCHPRD R
10/24/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/23/88 GT PB PANEL SCDATE 102488 SCHPRD BA
11/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 23RD JB PANEL SCDATE 112388 SCHPRD BA
12/16/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO LV TO FL BRF, CLK TO FL BRF, APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELRO SCDATE 121488 SCHPRD V
02/01/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/3/89 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 020689 SCHPRD BE
02/21/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 3/3/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD CHECK
03/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-24-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 030389 SCHPRD BE
03/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/24/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 031589 SCHPRD OPA
03/24/1989FiledBriefing Completed
03/24/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 032489 SCHPRD BE
09/21/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/21/1989SUBMITTED PANELFEBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/26/1989MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD