judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL H. HOLLY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0825
Short Caption:MICHAEL H. HOLLY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2377-87Filed Date:06/27/1988

Opening Event Date:06/27/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/25/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/07/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/09/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/08/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Dale Chance Saliba NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Edward Rosenthal NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Steven Weinberg YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Steven N. Gersten YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HOLLY, MICHAEL H. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: DARRIN A. CHASE & NOTE - 01 DARRYL T. WAYNES NOTE - 02 12/9/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 02 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 03 APPMT OF DALE CHANCE SALIBA NOTE - 03 VACATED & EDWARD ROSENTHAL NOTE - 04 APPTD FOR APLT; BRF OF APLT NOTE - 04 DUE 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETE NOTE - 05 RECORD IS FILED. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 3/10/89 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 06 FOR RECONSIDERATION W/OUT PREJ NOTE - 07 TO APLT'S INSTITUTING APPROP NOTE - 07 PROCEEDINGS TO OBTAIN MEDICAL NOTE - 08 TREATMENT. NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 1/25/90 ORD: GRANTG MO OF NOTE - 09 EDWARD ROSENTHAL, ESQ., TO NOTE - 10 W/DRAW; APPOINTING STEVEN NOTE - 10 WEINBERG, ESQ., TO REPRESENT NOTE - 11 APLT HEREIN; FORMER COUNSEL TO NOTE - 11 TRANSMIT RECORDS TO NEW COUNS NOTE - 12 FORTHWITH; BRIEF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 12 IN 40 DAYS.
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/01/09 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - WEINBERGS FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - GERSTENS FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 SALIBAD VACATED 12/9/88. ROSENTHALE VACATED 1/25/90
06/27/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/19/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DALE C. SALIBA, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 072988 SCHPRD DSA
09/08/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR BAIL/BOND PENDING APPEAL APPELLANT'S MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1988APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET BOND PENDING APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD OPE
09/20/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 082688 SCHPRD R
10/26/1988ORDER APLT'S MO FO BAIL PENDING APPEAL IS DENIED. PB PANELFESC SCDATE 102588 SCHPRD VS
11/30/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) EDWARD ROSENTHAL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-05. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 120688 SCHPRD GG
12/13/1988RECEIVED PRO SE FROM APLT RE INEFFEC- TIVE ASSISTANCE OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (8 PGS RT - BOSTON) GT PANEL SCDATE 101388 SCHPRD RT
01/25/1989LETTER TO APLT IN ANSWER TO HIS LTR RCVD 12/13/88 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1989MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF APPELLANT OF REQUEST FOR SETTING BAIL PENDING APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO COMPEL PRO- DUCTION OF TRANSCRIPT MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO COMPEL RT ONLY TO EXTENT THAT RT IS DUE BY 6/30/89. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD M
03/10/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELS 06-08. DAS PANELFESC SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD Q
05/01/1989RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 4/21/88 PROC FROM RPTR WRAY (NOT W/JUDGE) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(74 PGS/DAVIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
05/11/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (267 PGS - WRAY) JB PANEL SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD RT
06/19/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL RT FROM 4/20/88 PROCEED- INGS IS PLACED IN THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 062089 SCHPRD BA
07/19/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF 40 DAYS AFTER RT (4/20/88) HRG IS FILED. ACG PANELRO SCDATE 070389 SCHPRD OPE
09/25/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM SHELTON - 4/20/89 PROCEEDING (DUPLICATE REQUEST) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(73 PGS/SHELTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 080189 SCHPRD RT
11/20/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 5, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 120689 SCHPRD BA
11/28/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 01/05/90. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD V
12/06/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (EDWARD ROSENTHAL FOR APLT) AND APPOINT NEW COUNSEL GG PANEL SCDATE 010590 SCHPRD BA
01/25/1990FiledRecord Completed
01/25/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 09-12 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 120889 SCHPRD GG
03/02/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-30-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 030690 SCHPRD BA
03/22/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/30/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 030690 SCHPRD K
05/02/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 043090 SCHPRD BA
05/02/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1990ORDER APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FL LODGED BRF GRNTD. APLE'S BF DUE IN 30 DAYS FRM DATE OF THIS ORD. GR PANELDDW SCDATE 051890 SCHPRD Q
05/30/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION APLT MO FOR RELEASE PENDING APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1990APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO RENEWED MOTION TO SET BOND PENDING APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 061190 SCHPRD OPE
06/25/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-24-90 AD CWC PANEL SCDATE 062290 SCHPRD BE
07/24/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/07/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/07/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF CWC PANEL SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD OPA
08/16/1990ORDER DENYING APLT'S MOTION FOR RELEASE PENDING APPEAL. CWC PANELTEWAGA SCDATE 080790 SCHPRD MEMO
08/28/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(STIPULATION, EXHIBIT RELEASE FORM AND EXHIBITS 1A-1J,#2,#3,AND #6) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/09/1991ARGUED PANELTESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/08/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1991RECEIVED PRO SE MOTION FOR REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD