Case: 95-1291
95-1291
12/18/1995
Granted application that originated as 130(d) mo.
FORMOSA PLASTICS CORPORATION USA and FORMOSA PLASTIC CORPORATION, TEXAS
PRESIDIO ENGINEERS AND CONTRACTORS, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/05/1998 | Letter brief | Respondent | "Respondent's Post-Submission Letter Brief" Orig + 11 | |
02/03/1998 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filed | Orig + 11 | |
09/03/1997 | Reply Brief | Respondent | Respondent's reply to petitioner's response | |
08/20/1997 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Petitioner's motion for rehearing of cause filed | "Pets' Response to Resp's Mo/Re & Voluntary Remittitur" on behalf of Formosa | |
07/23/1997 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | Brief of Amicus Curiae on Motion For Rehearing from Mark P. Gergen, Univ. Of TX School Of Law, Austin, TX, 78705, 512/471-3521 | |
07/23/1997 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filed | "Resp's Motion For Rehearing & Voluntary Remittitur" on behalf of Presidio Engineers & Contractors, Inc. | |
11/18/1996 | Post submission brief filed | Respondent | on behalf of Presidio Engineers and Contractors, Inc. | |
09/27/1996 | Reply Brief | Petitioner | | |
09/26/1996 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | On behalf of Kajima International, Inc. by Christa Brown: 3355 Bee Cave Rd, Suite 612 Austin, Texas 78746 | |
09/25/1996 | Letter brief | Respondent | Clarification of Presubmission brief submitted on Sept.6,1996. | |
09/06/1996 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | Respondent's Pre-Submission Brief | |
05/15/1996 | Reply to Amicus Curiae Brief | Respondent | of Texas Civil Justice League | |
04/15/1996 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | on behalf of Texas Civil Justice League, by Jerry B. Donaldson, 1122 Colorado, Suite 210, Austin, TX 78702 512/469-0624 | |
03/18/1996 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
02/28/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/28/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate date of a process | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive mandate date. | | |
04/28/1998 | Mandate issued | | | |
03/13/1998 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Overruled | motion to clarify is overruled 960 SW2d 41 | |
03/13/1998 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | | |
03/05/1998 | Letter brief | "Respondent's Post-Submission Letter Brief" Orig + 11 | | |
03/05/1998 | Notice requesting filing fee | $10 fee from Atty Cynthia Sheppard | | |
02/09/1998 | Letter Filed | reply to Pet's Letter of 02-06-98, states that 2nd mo/re is a mo/re of the opinion and does not conform to rule 64.4 etc | | |
02/06/1998 | Letter Filed | Letter from Atty Mike Hatchell, Re: C/Resp's 2nd Motion for Rehearing | | |
02/03/1998 | Miscellaneous Motion | Motion to Clarify - 0 + 11 - incorporated into Mo/re | | |
02/03/1998 | Motion for Rehearing | Orig + 11 | | |
02/03/1998 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | Record remains in the Clerk's Office | | |
01/16/1998 | Dissenting opinion issued. | Dissent by J. Baker, joined by J. Spector | | |
01/16/1998 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | respondents' motion for rehearing and voluntary remitittur are overruled | |
01/16/1998 | Opinion issued | judgment of the coa reversed, remanded to tc | CA Judgment is rev and the cause is remanded to the TC. Opin by GA, joined bt TRP, RAG, NLH, CTE, PRO, and DH Judgment remains the same 960 SW2d 41 | |
01/16/1998 | Opinion issued | judgment of the coa reversed, remanded to tc | CA Judgment is rev and the cause is remanded to the TC. Opin by GA, joined bt TRP, RAG, NLH, CTE, PRO, and DH Judgment remains the same 960 SW2d 41 | |
01/16/1998 | Previous opinion withdrawn | This Court's opinion of July 9, 1997, is witthdrawn and the opinion this date is substituted. Dis. Op. by J. Baker & Judgment remains in place. | | |
01/09/1998 | Letter Received | | | |
09/03/1997 | Reply Brief | Respondent's reply to petitioner's response | | |
08/20/1997 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | "Pets' Response to Resp's Mo/Re & Voluntary Remittitur" on behalf of Formosa | | |
07/23/1997 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Brief of Amicus Curiae on Motion For Rehearing from Mark P. Gergen, Univ. Of TX School Of Law, Austin, TX, 78705, 512/471-3521 | | |
07/23/1997 | Motion for Rehearing | "Resp's Motion For Rehearing & Voluntary Remittitur" on behalf of Presidio Engineers & Contractors, Inc. | | |
07/23/1997 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | Record remains in the Clerk's Office | | |
07/09/1997 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | dismissed as moot | motion to advance decision of cause on appeal dismissed as moot | |
07/09/1997 | Opinion issued | judgment of the coa reversed, remanded to tc | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
07/09/1997 | Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record | judgment issued | | |
07/09/1997 | Dissenting opinion issued. | Dissenting opinion by Justice Baker, joined by Justice Spector. | | |
07/09/1997 | Opinion issued | Withdrawn | The CA judgment is reversed & the cause is remanded to the TC. Opinion by GA, joined by TRP, RAG, NLH, JC, CTE, PRO. WITHDRAWN 01/16/98 | |
07/09/1997 | Opinion issued | Withdrawn | The CA judgment is reversed & the cause is remanded to the TC. Opinion by GA, joined by TRP, RAG, NLH, JC, CTE, PRO. WITHDRAWN 01/16/98 | |
11/20/1996 | Letter Filed | Letter stating correction to a typographical error in the Post-Sub Brief of 11-18-96 | | |
11/18/1996 | Post submission brief filed | on behalf of Presidio Engineers and Contractors, Inc. | | |
10/01/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission date of a process | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submission info. | | |
10/01/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted date of a process | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submitted date. | | |
10/01/1996 | Oral argument | argued for petitioners by Michael A. Hatchell for respondents by William Powers, Jr. | ||
09/27/1996 | Reply Brief | | | |
09/26/1996 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | On behalf of Kajima International, Inc. by Christa Brown: 3355 Bee Cave Rd, Suite 612 Austin, Texas 78746 | | |
09/25/1996 | Letter brief | Clarification of Presubmission brief submitted on Sept.6,1996. | | |
09/06/1996 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent's Pre-Submission Brief | | |
06/14/1996 | Miscellaneous Motion | Respondent's motion to advance decision of cause on appeal | | |
05/31/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Filing granted | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
05/31/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Filing granted | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
05/31/1996 | Amount of time allotted for oral argument. | 20-20 minutes to argue | | |
05/31/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Filing granted | Granted on Pts. 4, 13, 17, 19 & 20 | |
05/31/1996 | Set for Submission | to be argue 1 October, 1996, at 9:00 a.m. | | |
05/31/1996 | Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals. | | | |
05/15/1996 | Reply to Amicus Curiae Brief | of Texas Civil Justice League | | |
04/15/1996 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | on behalf of Texas Civil Justice League, by Jerry B. Donaldson, 1122 Colorado, Suite 210, Austin, TX 78702 512/469-0624 | | |
03/20/1996 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
03/18/1996 | Reply to Response | | | |
02/28/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | | |
12/19/1995 | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILED | due 02-07-96 | | |
12/19/1995 | Extension of time to file app writ err disposed of | Filing granted | app due 02-07-96 | |
12/18/1995 | Extension of time to file app writ err filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/28/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 30-D-3 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
PRESIDIO ENGINEERS & CONTRACTO | Respondent | Mr. William Powers Jr. Mr. Robert P. Houston Ms. Cynthia Truax Sheppard |
PRESIDIO ENGINEERS AND CONTRAC | Respondent | Mr. John W. Griffin Jr. |
FORMOSA PLASTICS CORPORATION | Petitioner | Mr. Joseph R. Knight The Honorable Bob E. Shannon Mr. Mike A. Hatchell Mr. Joe R. Greenhill |
FORMOSA PLASTICS CORP. | Petitioner | Ms. Molly H. Hatchell Mr. Andy G. Navarro |
Court of Appeals Information:
13-93-00294-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
941 SW2d 138, 11-02-95
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Calhoun County Court
Calhoun
Honorable Michael Fricke
92-CV-388