judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EXECUTIVE MANAGEMENT VS. TICOR TITLE PREVIOUSLY C/W 35122/35698

Case Information: 34760
Short Caption:EXECUTIVE MANAGEMENT VS. TICOR TITLE PREVIOUSLY C/W 35122/35698Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:34760*, 35698 Related Case(s): 35122 , 35698 , 47592
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A292928Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1999 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/01/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
09/01/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from George R. Carter--check no. 1339.
09/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08200
09/03/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/09/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. 00-02071
02/11/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-02183
02/22/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Ticor Title Co.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. 00-02750
02/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Joinder in Ticor Title Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. 00-03132
03/02/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Ticor's Request for Permission to File a Reply to Executive Management's Opposition to Ticor's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. 00-03280
03/02/2000MotionReceived Reply to Response. Ticor's Reply to Executive Management's Opposition to Ticor's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. 00-03282
04/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. Cause appearing, we consolidate Docket Nos. 34760, 35122 and 35698 for all appellate purposes. The settlement judge in Docket Nos. 34760 and 35122 filed reports indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Accordingly, appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a docketing statement for each of the consolidated appeals. We defer ruling on respondent Ticor Title Insurance's motion to dismiss Docket No. 34760 pending completion of our jurisdictional review. fn1[We grant respondent Ticor's motion to file a reply in support of its motion to dismiss. The clerk of this court shall forthwith file the reply provisionally submitted on March 2, 2000.] The briefing schedule and time for filing a transcript request form in these consolidated appeals shall remain suspended pending completion of our jurisdictional review. Nos. 34760, 35122, 35698. 00-06719
04/25/2000MotionFiled Reply to Response. Ticor's Reply to Executive Management's Opposition to Ticor's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. 00-03282
05/12/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. (Attachments in original copy not provided in second copy; document not securely fastened).
05/17/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-08230
06/20/2000Other Other. Filed Respondent Ticor Title Insurance Company's Supplemental Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Nos. 34760, 35122, 35698. 00-10583
07/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Dismissing Appeals in Docket Nos. 34760 and 35698 and Reinstating Briefing in Docket No. 35122. We agree that appellant's August 27, 1999, notice of appeal in Docket No. 34760 was prematurely filed. We therefore grant the motion to dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 34760 and " . . . we dismiss that appeal." We lack jurisdiction over the appeal in Docket No. 35698 and " . . . order it dismissed." fn1[On February 28, 2000, the clerk of this court issued a notice to appellant to pay the filing fee for the appeal in Docket No. 35698. To date, the fiing fee has not been paid. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to pay the filing fee.] The appeal in Docket No. 31522 shall proceed as an appeal challenging the July 29, 1999, and October 7, 1999, orders. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 31522. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). NNP99B-RR/DA/ML. Nos. 34760, 35122, 35698. Document No.00-13004. 00-13004
07/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Order Dismissing Appeals in Docket Nos. 34760 and 35698 and Reinstating Briefing in Docket No. 35122. We agree that appellant's August 27, 1999, notice of appeal in Docket No. 34760 was prematurely filed. We therefore grant the motion to dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 34760 and " . . . we dismiss that appeal." We lack jurisdiction over the appeal in Docket No. 35698 and " . . . order it dismissed." fn1[On February 28, 2000, the clerk of this court issued a notice to appellant to pay the filing fee for the appeal in Docket No. 35698. To date, the fiing fee has not been paid. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to pay the filing fee.] The appeal in Docket No. 31522 shall proceed as an appeal challenging the July 29, 1999, and October 7, 1999, orders. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 31522. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). NNP99B-RR/DA/ML. Nos. 34760, 35122, 35698. 01-05002
08/22/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13620
08/22/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13620
02/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Modifying Caption in Docket No. 35122. On July 26, 2000, this court entered an order dismissing the appeals in Docket Nos. 34760 and 35698 and reinstating briefing in Docket No. 35122. The order further determined that the respondents in Docket Nos. 34760 and 35698 should be respondents in Docket No. 35122. We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption in Docket No. 35122 by adding the following parties as respondents: Ticor Title Insurance Company, a foreign Corporation; Barbara Marks, an Individual; The Manley Marks and Barbara Marks 1988 Trustee; and Marks Plaza, a Nevada Corporation. Nos. 34760/35122/35698. (01-02705)