judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION; and FMC CORPORATION v. LAWRENCE FAULKNER

Case Heading (06-22)
Case Number:06-22Case Docketed On:02/01/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION; and FMC CORPORATION v. LAWRENCE FAULKNER
Full Title:STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION; and FMC CORPORATION, Appellants (Petitioner/Employer), v. LAWRENCE FAULKNER, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Brandon Wayne Snyder
Thomas A. Thompson
AppellantFMC CorporationGeorge E. Lemich
AppelleeLawrence FaulknerMichael D. Newman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 31
Citation:152 P.3d 394

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/01/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/01/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/01/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/28/2006Motion - Withdrawal of counsel. Motion for order allowing withdrawal of attorney and substitution of counsel.MotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
03/01/2006Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel. Kristi M. Radosevich allowed to withdraw. Brandon W. Snyder is substituted as counsel for the State of Wyoming.OrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
03/15/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/15/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/03/2006Notice-Incoming - Designation of record - Appellant's.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
04/05/2006Brief - Appellant. Joint brief of appellants State of Wyoming, ex rel., Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division and FMC Corporation.BriefAppellantFinal
05/19/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/05/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief (faxed copy)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/06/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/07/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief (original)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/07/2006Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/26/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record; volume III, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/10/2006Correspondence - Incoming. Notice of change of firm name. (George Lemich)CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
07/21/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/14/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Brandon W. Snyder, Special Assistant Attorney General, Thomas A. Thompson, Special Assistant Attorney General, and George Lemich, argument by Mr. Thompson for appellants; Michael D. Newman for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/14/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/22/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affriming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/26/2007Motion - Fees and costs. Motion for payment of attorney's fees.MotionFees and costsFinal
03/20/2007Order - Grant. Order awarding attorney's fees.OrderGrantFinal
03/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/20/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/20/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/22/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal