judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARK D. JENKINS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (06-145)
Case Number:06-145Case Docketed On:06/23/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:MARK D. JENKINS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:MARK D. JENKINS, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMark D. JenkinsMichael H. Schilling
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 39
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/23/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/23/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/23/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/23/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/31/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
09/12/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and received copy of designation of recordBriefAppelleeFinal
09/22/2006Brief - Appellant reply; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/22/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/27/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record; Volume III, TranscriptRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/27/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
10/03/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/14/2006Event - Oral argument presented before full court (Michael Schilling for appellant; Kristi M. Radosevich, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
03/09/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the Court. Justice Kite filed a dissenting opinionOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/13/2007Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
03/13/2007Affidavit - Attorney fees and costsAffidavitAttorney fees and costsFinal
04/03/2007Order - Other - awarding attorney's fees and costsOrderOtherFinal
04/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/03/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal