judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHAWN EUGENE PARKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0860
Short Caption:SHAWN EUGENE PARKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM814-10Filed Date:07/08/2010

Opening Event Date:07/08/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/27/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/12/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantShawn Eugene Parker Y
Jeffrey L. LightNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Jeffrey Light, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
07/28/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Jeffrey Light, Esquire
08/02/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
08/27/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (72pgs/Tape) 7/1/10 proc.
08/27/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (23pgs/Tape) 7/2/10 proc. w/CD included
08/27/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/31/2010RECORD INDEX
08/31/2010RECORD COPIES
09/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ) For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
10/18/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
10/28/2010ORDER DENY APLT MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL without prejudice to its renewal accompanied by a statement of appellant pro se in accordance with the requirements of Johnson v. United States, 513 A.2d 798 (D.C. 1986) or a statement of the steps taken to locate client. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, file a new motion to withdraw this appeal, or file the brief and limited appendix. (By: ETW)
11/29/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
12/01/2010TMC - counsel's motion to dismiss
12/20/2010On consideration of cousnel's motion to dismiss, it is ORDERED that the motion to dismiss isgranted and the appeal is hreby dismissed due to appellant's fialur eto assist in the prosecution of his appeal. (RDOBFA)
12/20/2010DISMISSED
01/12/2011MANDATE ISSUED