judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

OVERSEAS COMMUNICATIONS VS. DCI TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Case Information: 34759
Short Caption:OVERSEAS COMMUNICATIONS VS. DCI TELECOMMUNICATIONSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9806662Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1999 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/01/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from J.T. Cardinalli, Inc.--check no. 1042.
09/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08196
09/03/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
05/31/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 22, 2000. 00-09199
06/23/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Complete copy of Order filed 7/29/99. Due Date: 10 days
08/31/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: no date listed. 00-15401
10/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of the district court shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, transmit a copy of the order filed on July 29, 1999, in Case No. CV9806662. 00-18450
10/25/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 7/29/99. 00-18868
10/26/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter. Carolyn Worrell.
02/21/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-03413
02/21/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
03/08/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-04234
05/01/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellants have failed to file either a docketing statement or a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are requested. Appellants shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required documents. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. (Docketing statement mailed to J. T. Cardinalli, counsel for appellants.) 01-07251
06/14/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellants have failed to comply with either our March 8, 2001, or May 1, 2001, orders. ' . . . we dismiss this appeal as abandoned.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-09958
06/29/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Mark Van Wagoner enclosing Stipulated Motion to Dismiss signed by appellant's counsel only. The letter states that since this matter is now moot, the enclosed copy is for the file only. 01-11044
07/11/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10417
07/11/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/25/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2001. 01-10417