Case: 04-03-00732-CR
04-03-00732-CR
10/01/2003
Murder
Jerail Bernard Pleasant
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/17/2004 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
02/12/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/10/2003 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed | |
12/10/2003 | Submitted | | |
12/10/2003 | Submission | | |
10/31/2003 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
10/20/2003 | Order Entered | | |
10/02/2003 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
10/01/2003 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
10/01/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
09/26/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
07/31/2003 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
07/02/2003 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/12/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Pleasant, Jerail Bernard | Criminal - Appellant | Cornelius N. Cox Karen Amos |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Susan D. Reed |
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mary D. Roman
2002-CR-6131-B
48 YEARS TDCJ & $1000 FINE