Case: 05-04-01489-CR
05-04-01489-CR
10/15/2004
Sexual Assault
Alexander, Paul Anthony
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/06/2006 | Letter Received | | |
05/30/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/30/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/03/2006 | Record Returned | | |
03/29/2006 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | |
01/31/2006 | Record Shipped | | |
01/30/2006 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
01/27/2006 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
11/22/2005 | Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/01/2005 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/01/2005 | Record Retention | Retain | |
11/01/2005 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/05/2005 | Submitted | | |
10/05/2005 | Submission | | |
10/05/2005 | Submitted | | |
08/08/2005 | Submission | | |
06/10/2005 | Brief Filed | | |
06/10/2005 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/10/2005 | Brief Due | | |
06/10/2005 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/12/2005 | Brief Due | | |
04/22/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/21/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
04/12/2005 | Brief Filed | | |
04/12/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/11/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
04/04/2005 | Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed | | |
04/04/2005 | Brief Due | | |
03/23/2005 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/21/2005 | Motion for Leave to File | | |
03/08/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/07/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/04/2005 | Brief Due | | |
02/16/2005 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |
02/02/2005 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
01/28/2005 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
01/28/2005 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
01/26/2005 | Extension on Reporter's Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
01/12/2005 | Record due | | |
01/10/2005 | Extension on Reporter's Record | | |
10/20/2004 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
10/18/2004 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
10/15/2004 | 25.2 Certification filed | | |
10/15/2004 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
10/15/2004 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
09/20/2004 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
09/20/2004 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
09/14/2004 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/30/2006 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Paul Anthony Alexander | Criminal - Appellant | John H. Hagler |
Debi Harris | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Debi Harris |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | William T. (Bill) Hill, Jr. Christi Dean |
Jacqueline Galindo | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Jacqueline Galindo |
Trial Court Information
204th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Mark Harkness Nancarrow
F02-30006-TQ
7 Yrs/$1000 Fine