Case: 04-95-00811-CV
04-95-00811-CV
10/30/1995
Divorce
Toni Livingston
Michael Louis Vickers
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/28/1996 | Original Exhibits Returned | | |
08/28/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/28/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/10/1996 | Opinion issued | Affirmed in Part/Reversed & Remanded in Part | |
07/10/1996 | Opinion issued | Affirmed in Part/Reversed & Remanded in Part | |
06/25/1996 | Submitted | | |
06/25/1996 | Submission | | |
06/25/1996 | Submitted | | |
06/14/1996 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
05/03/1996 | Submission | | |
12/21/1995 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
12/21/1995 | Reply brief filed | | |
12/12/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
12/12/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/12/1995 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
12/12/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/21/1995 | Order Entered | | |
11/21/1995 | Order Entered | | |
11/21/1995 | Order Entered | | |
11/20/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
11/20/1995 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
11/13/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
11/13/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
11/13/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
11/09/1995 | Exhibits Filed | | |
11/09/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
11/09/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
11/09/1995 | Exhibits received | | |
11/01/1995 | Order Entered | | |
11/01/1995 | Order Entered | | |
11/01/1995 | Order Entered | | |
10/30/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
10/30/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
10/30/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
10/11/1995 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
10/11/1995 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
09/25/1995 | Exhibits Filed | | |
09/25/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
09/25/1995 | Exhibits received | | |
09/25/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
07/24/1995 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
07/20/1995 | Request for Findings of Fact Filed | | |
07/14/1995 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/28/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Michael Louis Vickers | Appellee | Baldemar Garcia, Jr. Donato D. Ramos |
Toni Livingston | Appellant | John Robert King M. Steven Deck |
Trial Court Information
229th Judicial District Court
Jim Hogg
Honorable Ricardo H. Garcia
3615
N/A