St Vs James B Chadwell II | § § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Chadwell, James B, II | ||||
Us 21 South Lot 1 Peru, IN 46970 | |||||
State Plaintiff | State of Indiana | Bruce Carter Embrey
765-863-1188(W) | |||
Charges: Chadwell, James B, II | Citation | Statute | Level | Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | BATTERY RESULTING IN BODILY INJURY- | N/A | 35-42-2-1(a)(1)(A) | Misdemeanor Class A | 04/08/1999 |
04/09/1999 | Converted Event Docket Note: PROB | ||
---|---|---|---|
04/09/1999 | Converted Event Docket Level Entry: Entry/Fee - Book: 8 Page: | ||
04/09/1999 | Converted Event Information Filed: Warrant Issued: slh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/09/1999 | ||
04/09/1999 | Converted Event Defendant appears pro se. State appears by Jeffrey K. Sinkovics. Defendant advised of rights and enters plea of not guilty. Public Defender appointed. Trial set for Friday, June 11, 1999 at 8:00 a.m. Notice Ordered. gma (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/09/1999 | ||
04/20/1999 | Converted Event Michael Boonstra files Entry of Appearance on behalf of Defendant, together with Certificate of Service. bb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/20/1999 | ||
06/08/1999 | Converted Event Defendant, by counsel, files Motion for Continuance, together with Certificate of Service. bb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 06/08/1999 | ||
06/09/1999 | Converted Event Motion granted. Trial continued to July 2nd, 1999 at 8:00 a.m. jh (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 06/08/1999 | ||
06/09/1999 | Converted Event State of Indiana, by Jeffery Sinkovics, files State's Answer to Discovery and Request for Discovery, together with Certificate of Service. bb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 06/09/1999 | ||
06/18/1999 | Converted Event Defendant, by counsel, files Notice of Defense of Self Defense, together with Certificate of Service. bb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 06/18/1999 | ||
07/02/1999 | Converted Event Calendar: TRIAL (Time: 08:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
07/02/1999 | Converted Event By agreement of parties this cause is continued to July 23, 1999 at 8:00 A.M. ssg. (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 07/02/1999 | ||
07/23/1999 | Converted Event Calendar: TRIAL (Time: 08:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
07/23/1999 | Judgment 1. BATTERY RESULTING IN BODILY INJURY- Dismissed | ||
07/27/1999 | Converted Event Defendant appears with counsel, State appears by Jeffrey Sinkovics. By Motion of the State this cause is dismissed. CAUSE DISMISSED. bb (DISPOSED: DI ) (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 07/23/1999 | ||
09/02/1999 | Converted Event Michael Boonstra files Motion to Withdraw Appearance, together with Certificate of Service. bb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/02/1999 | ||
09/07/1999 | Converted Event Court grants Motion to Withdraw. Michael Boonstra WITHDRAWN bb (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/03/1999 | ||
02/22/2006 | Converted Event All documents associated with this case have been scanned and attached to this file in accordance with the County Weeding Policy. ss (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/22/2006 |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
52C01-9904-CM-000074 | Chadwell, James B, II | 04/09/1999 Miami Circuit Court | CM - Criminal Misdemeanor Decided |
|