St Vs James B Chadwell II | § § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Chadwell, James B | Michael Edward Boonstra Public Defender
574-753-4147(W) | |||
Us 31 South Lot 1 Peru, IN 46970 | |||||
State Plaintiff | State of Indiana | Bruce Carter Embrey
765-863-1188(W) | |||
Charges: Chadwell, James B | Citation | Statute | Level | Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | ILLEGAL POSSESSION OF AN ALCOHOLIC BEVER- | N/A | 7.1-5-7-7(1) | Misdemeanor Class C | 04/06/1999 |
04/08/1999 | Converted Event docket level comment: $8,000.00 SURETY BON | ||
---|---|---|---|
04/08/1999 | Converted Event Docket Note: PROB | ||
04/08/1999 | Converted Event Calendar: INITIAL HEARING (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
04/09/1999 | Converted Event Docket Level Entry: Entry/Fee - Book: 8 Page: | ||
04/09/1999 | Converted Event Offense #1, Count ID I : (Jail Sent. [60] [D])(Sent. Susp. [60] [D])(Probation [1] [Y])(Probation Type [F])(Fine Amount [200]) | ||
04/09/1999 | Converted Event Information Filed: Court date set for Thursday, April 8, 1999 at 1:00 p.m.: slh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/09/1999 | ||
04/09/1999 | Judgment 1. ILLEGAL POSSESSION OF AN ALCOHOLIC BEVER- Finding of Guilty | ||
04/14/1999 | Converted Event Defendant appears, State appears by Jeffrey Sinkovics. Defendant advised of rights and enters a plea of guilty. court finds defendant guilty and sentneces him to the Miami County Jail for 60 days. Sentence suspended except for time served and placed on probation for one year. Rules of Probation filed. Alcohol/Drug evaluation. Fine $200.00 CC $125.00 Initial PSF $50.00 and$10.00 monthly. Defendant is to pay fees and costs within 30 days. JUDGMENT ON FINDING bb (DISPOSED: BT ) (RJO? Y) (Alt Judge T ) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/09/1999 | ||
08/25/1999 | Converted Event Probation Department, by Lee Mathew, files Notice of Probation Violation. A warrant is now issued for the arrest of the Defendant and the same is made returnable forthwith. No bond. bb (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 08/23/1999 | ||
09/02/1999 | Converted Event Defendant appears, State appears by Wil Siders. Initial held on probation violation and court appoints public defender. Set for pre-trial along with other pending charges on October 28, 1999 at 1:00 P.M. ssg (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/02/1999 | ||
09/21/1999 | Converted Event Michael Boonstra files Entry of Appearance on behalf of Defendant, together with Certificate of Service. bb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/21/1999 | ||
09/29/1999 | Converted Event State of Indiana, by Jeffrey Sinkovics, files State's Answer to Discovery and Request for Discovery, together with Certificate of Service. bb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/29/1999 | ||
10/28/1999 | Converted Event Calendar: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
10/28/1999 | Converted Event Pre-trial conference report filed. Change of plea set for November 4, 1999 at 1:00 P.M. ssg (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 10/28/1999 | ||
11/04/1999 | Converted Event Calendar: GUILTY PLEA (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
11/05/1999 | Converted Event Comes now the defendant by counsel, Michael Boonstra, and comes now the State of Indiana by Jeffrey Sinkovics. By agreement matter is reset to Monday, November 8, 1999 at 8:00 a.m. tll (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 11/04/1999 | ||
11/08/1999 | Converted Event Calendar: GUILTY PLEA (Time: 08:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
01/06/2000 | Converted Event State, by Jeffrey Sinkovics, file Motion to Dismiss Probation Violation, together with Certificate of Service. bb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 01/06/2000 | ||
01/10/2000 | Converted Event Court grants Motion to Dismiss Probation Violation. bb (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 01/07/2000 | ||
04/05/2000 | Converted Event Probation Department, by Jeremy Boardman, files Notice of Probation Violation. A warrant is now issued for the arrest of the Defendant and the same is made returnable forthwith. No bond. bb (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/05/2000 | ||
04/06/2000 | Converted Event Calendar: PROBATION VIOLATION (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
04/06/2000 | Converted Event Defendant appears, State appears by Jeffrey Sinkovics. Initial hearing on probation violation. Denial entered. Pre-trial set for June 1, 2000 at 1:00 P.M. Jurytrial set for August 21, 2000 at 9:00 A.M. Jury status set for August 7, 2000 at 8:00 A.M. Court appoints Public Defender. ssg (KLS) (RJO? N) (Alt Judge T ) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/06/2000 | ||
04/19/2000 | Converted Event Michael Boonstra files Entry of Appearance on behalf of Defendant, together with Certificate of Service. bb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/19/2000 | ||
04/26/2000 | Converted Event State of Indiana, by Jeffrey Sinkovics, files State's Answer to Discovery and Request for Discovery, together with Certificate of Service. bb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/26/2000 | ||
05/12/2000 | Converted Event Defendant, by counsel, files Motion for Continuance, together with Certificate of Service. cfw (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 05/12/2000 | ||
05/15/2000 | Converted Event Motion granted. Pre-trial continued to June 29th, 2000 at 1:00 p.m. and Jury Status continued to August 14th, 2000 at 8:00 a.m. jh (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 05/15/2000 | ||
06/01/2000 | Converted Event Calendar: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: C01) Hearing Code: (D) | ||
06/29/2000 | Converted Event Calendar: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
06/30/2000 | Converted Event Defendant fails to apper. State appears by Wil Siders. Court issues a bench warrant for arrest of defendant and the same is made returnable forthwith. No bond. cfs (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 06/29/2000 | ||
08/07/2000 | Converted Event Calendar: STATUS HEARING (Time: 08:00:00) (Judge: C01) Hearing Code: (D) | ||
08/14/2000 | Converted Event Calendar: STATUS HEARING (Time: 08:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
08/16/2000 | Converted Event State appears by Wil Siders. Defendant fails to appear and Court now issues a bench warrant for the arrest of defendant and the same is made returnable forthwith. No bond. cfs (WARRANT RESCINDED 5/26/17) alr 5/30/17 (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 08/14/2000 | ||
08/21/2000 | Converted Event Calendar: JURY TRIAL (Time: 09:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
02/22/2006 | Converted Event All documents associated with this case have been scanned and attached to this file in accordance with the County Weeding Policy. ss (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/22/2006 | ||
05/24/2017 | Converted Event State, by Jeffrey Sinkovics files Motion to Rescind Warrant & Dismiss Probation Violation, together with Certificate of Service. slr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 05/24/2017 | ||
05/30/2017 | Converted Event 5/26/17, Comes now the Court and Grants Motion to rescind warrant and Dismiss probation violation. alr (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 05/30/2017 |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
52C01-9904-CM-000073 | Chadwell, James B | 04/08/1999 Miami Circuit Court | CM - Criminal Misdemeanor Decided |
|