judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GLEN R. WAYT v. HEATHER M. URBIGKIT

Case Heading (06-125)
Case Number:06-125Case Docketed On:06/07/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:GLEN R. WAYT v. HEATHER M. URBIGKIT
Full Title:GLEN R. WAYT, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. HEATHER M. URBIGKIT, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGlen R. Wayt Pro Se
AppelleeHeather M. UrbigkitMarvin L. Bishop III

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 34
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/07/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/07/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/07/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/23/2006Correspondence - Incoming from appellant re motion pending in district courtCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
07/20/2006Brief - Appellant, received two copies of briefBriefAppellantFinal
07/20/2006Correspondence - Outgoing to appellant requesting four more copies of brief for filingCorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
07/25/2006Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
08/02/2006Response/Objection - Motion to dismissResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
08/02/2006Brief - Other - replacement cover page for appellant's briefBriefOtherFinal
08/17/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
08/17/2006Brief - Other - Received additional copies of appellant's brief. Filed copies with date of original filingBriefOtherFinal
08/22/2006Order - Denying motion to dismiss appealOrderDenyFinal
08/30/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/05/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/05/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/16/2007Motion - Supplemental briefing (reply brief)MotionSupplemental briefingFinal
01/30/2007Order - Denying motion for leave to supplement reply briefOrderDenyFinal
03/02/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/12/2007Service - Mail returned - copy of opinion sent to AppellantServiceMail returnedFinal
03/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/20/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal