Case: 08-96-00028-CR
08-96-00028-CR
01/25/1996
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Hernandez, Gabriel
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/16/1999 | Fee paid | | |
02/02/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/02/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/11/1997 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/27/1997 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/30/1997 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/26/1997 | Miscellaneous Motion Filed | | |
06/20/1997 | Opinion issued | Otherwise Disposed | |
06/20/1997 | Opinion issued | Otherwise Disposed | |
06/04/1997 | Submitted | | |
06/04/1997 | Submission | | |
06/04/1997 | Submitted | | |
05/01/1997 | Submission | | |
03/27/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
03/27/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/27/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/26/1997 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/26/1997 | Order entered | | |
03/14/1997 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
02/26/1997 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/10/1997 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
12/23/1996 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/10/1996 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
11/12/1996 | Brief Filed | | |
09/18/1996 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/18/1996 | Order entered | | |
09/05/1996 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
07/31/1996 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/19/1996 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
05/08/1996 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/22/1996 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
04/03/1996 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
03/19/1996 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
02/28/1996 | Motion for Extension Statement of Facts Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/15/1996 | Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed | | |
02/09/1996 | Transcript Filed | | |
01/25/1996 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/25/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/02/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Jaime E. Esparza |
HERNANDEZ, GABRIEL | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. M. Clara Hernandez |
Trial Court Information
210th District Court
El Paso
80612
95 Yrs. TDC