Case Information: 44842 | |||
Short Caption: | VERGARA (STEVE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C204697 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/09/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/09/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 05-04769 | |
03/09/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 12/8/04, 12/9/04 and 1/21/05. Court Reporter: Loree Gallegos. Filed in district court on: March 4, 2005. | 05-04770 | |
04/14/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: December 8, 2004 and December 9, 2004, vols. 1 and 2. Court Reporter: Loree Gallegos. | 05-07312 | |
04/14/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 05-07366 | |
04/28/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Court reporter or recorder Loree Gallegos shall file the sentencing transcript from January 21, 2005, within 10 days of this order. The motion for an extension of time is granted. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcript within which to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | 05-08423 | |
06/07/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. on April 28, 2005, this court ordered court reporter or recorder Loree Gallegos to file the transcript on or before May 9, 2005. On May 23, 2005, Gallegos submitted the transcript. Although the transcript is overdue and Gallegos did not file a motion for an extension, this court elects to file the transcript in the interest of expediting this appeal. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the transcript received on May 23, 2005. | 05-11160 | |
06/07/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: Friday, January 21, 2005. Court Reporter: Loree Gallegos. | 05-10129 | |
07/05/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 05-13277 | |
07/05/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 05-13278 | |
07/19/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 05-14329 | |
01/11/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP | 06-00756 | |
02/07/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-01382 | |
02/07/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/02/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 9, 2006. | 06-01382 |