Case Information: 44841 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE VS. HELT, JR. (CURTIS) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C203019 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Pretrial |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/09/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/09/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 05-04768 | |
04/21/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 05-07785 | |
04/21/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 05-07806 | |
06/06/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. respondent's counsel David Lee Phillips shall file and serve the fast track response within 10 days of the date of this order or show cause why Phillips should not be sanctioned. | 05-11018 | |
07/27/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondent's counsel David Lee Phillips has not filed the fast track response, nor has he communicated with this court regarding this appeal. Phillips shall file the fast track response within 10 days of the date of this order, or this court will order Phillips to appear personally before a single justice of this court and show cause why he should not be held in contempt and sanctioned further, including referral to the State Bar. | 05-14925 | |
08/08/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 12 pages. | 05-15632 | |
08/08/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 05-15633 | |
08/11/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Submit Supplemental Appendix and Supplemental Point and Authority. | 05-15921 | |
08/11/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Response. Appellee Curtis Helt's Supplemental Fact (Fast)Track Response. | 05-15925 | |
08/11/2005 | Appendix | Received Appendix. Appelee Curtis Helt Jr.'s Supplemental Appendix. | 05-15927 | |
09/06/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed August 11, 2005. The clerk shall file the supplemental fast track response and appendix provisionally submitted on August 11, 2005. | 05-17502 | |
09/06/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Appellee Curtis Helt's Supplemental Fact (Fast) Track Response. | 05-15925 | |
09/06/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. Appelee Curtis Helt Jr.'s Supplemental Appendix. | 05-15927 | |
10/25/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH | 05-21086 | |
11/16/2005 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | 05-22559 | |
12/21/2005 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP06-WM/MG/JH | 05-24872 | |
01/17/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-00412 | |
01/17/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/25/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 19, 2006. | 06-00412 |