Case Information: 42862 | |||
Short Caption: | ECHEVARRIA VS. BISHOP | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A397440 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/09/2004 / Holland Johnson, Susan | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/01/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
03/01/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 04-03829 | |
03/01/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
03/09/2004 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Susan Holland Johnson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/31/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to file Docketing Statement and pay Filing Fee. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement and submit the filing fee to the clerk of this court. | 04-05949 | |
04/12/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Anthony R. Lopez-check no. 4488. | ||
04/12/2004 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Not signed by counsel. | ||
04/15/2004 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 04-06933 | |
05/24/2004 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 04-09535 | |
06/23/2004 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Stayed. Conclusions of Settlement Proceedings and to Show CauseThe settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. The settlement judge concludes that appellant failed to participate in good faith in the settlement conference process. Based on that conduct, the settlement judge recommends that this appeal be dismissed as abandoned. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a response to the settlement judge's report and show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed pursuant to the settlement judge's recommendation. | 04-11407 | |
03/07/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant has failed to respond to the order to show cause. Cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed as abandoned." NNP05-WM/MD/RP | 05-04394 | |
04/01/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-04726 | |
04/01/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/07/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 4, 2005. | 05-04726 |