judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL E. GILLUM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1471
Short Caption:MICHAEL E. GILLUM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 84-CF-1790 Consolidated:89-CF-1471
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2078-83Filed Date:

Opening Event Date:Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/17/1992
Argued/Submitted:05/18/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/05/1993

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael E. Gillum N
Lawrence M. Baskir YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
G. Bradley Weinsheimer NN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GILLUM, MICHAEL E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902SCRND/SUM I
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 10/03/90 ORD: M. BASKIR APPTD NOTE - 01 TO REPT. APLT; DSA DUE W/IN NOTE - 02 10 DAYS. NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 CON: 84-1790 NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 01/24/90 ORD: TRIAL COUNSEL NOTE - 04 DTD 11/9/84, AS A SUPPLEMENTAL NOTE - 05 RECORD FORTHWITH. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 5/21/90 ORD: THAT BRF OF APLT NOTE - 06 DUE ON 6/29/90, BRF OF APLE NOTE - 07 DUE ON 7/31/90, AND REPLY BRF NOTE - 07 OF APLT DUE ON 8/9/90. FO NOTE - 08 THAT NO EXTS OF TIME WILL BE NOTE - 08 ALLOWED ABSENT EXTRAORDINARY NOTE - 09 CIRCUMSTANCES. NOTE - 09 NOTE - 10 9/3/91 ORD: DENIED MOTION FOR NOTE - 10 CLARIFICATION & RECONSIDERA- NOTE - 11 TION, F/O DENIED EX PARTE REQ NOTE - 11 FOR LV TO W/D AS COUNSEL, F/O NOTE - 12 THE BRF OF APLT SHALL BE FILED NOTE - 12 W/IN 20 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORD. NOTE - 13 01/17/92 ORD: GR MOS OF APLE; NOTE - 13 CLK SHALL FL LODGED ATTACH- NOTE - 14 MENTS TO APLE'S MO AS A SUPP NOTE - 14 REC; LODGED BRIEFS OF APLT & NOTE - 15 APLE ARE FILED; CASE SHALL BE NOTE - 15 SCHED FOR CONSIDERATION BEFORE NOTE - 16 A MERITS DIV OF THIS CRT AS NOTE - 16 SOON AS THE CALENDAR PERMITS.
09/11/1989PROCEED WITH APPEAL, NO LONGER ON HOLD/STAYED
01/03/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LAWRENCE M. BASKIR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1990ORDER SS CONSOLIDATING 84-1790 & 89- 1471 FOR ALL PURP; FO LAWRENCE (SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 & 2) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1990ORDER GRANTING MOTION AND DIRG CLK, SUPER. CT. TO TRANSMIT MOT OF (SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 & 5) FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD R
04/24/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT TO FILE DOCKETING STATEMENT W/IN 10 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 011690 SCHPRD DSA
05/08/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 050490 SCHPRD DSA
05/21/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 6 THRU 9 SL PANELFF SCDATE 051890 SCHPRD CHECK
06/21/1990ORDER SS AMENDING BRF SCHED: APLT DUE 7/25; APLE DUE 8/29; RBA IF ANY DUE 9/13. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1990APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD RENEWED--APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1991APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD RENEWED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1991RECEIVED PRO SE MOTION FROM APPELLANT TO EXPEDITE APPEAL & BRIEFING SCHEDULE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/03/1991ORDER APLTS MO TO SUPP R IS DENIED. REQ. FOR NEW COUNSEL D. REQ FOR TRANSFER D. BA DUE IN 40. PANELPC SCDATE 051591 SCHPRD VS
06/17/1991COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APLT (EX PARTE) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION MOTION FOR CLARIFATION OF ORDER FOR RECONSIDERATION, AND FOR OTHER PURPOSES PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1991STATEMENT RE MISSING MOTION OF RECUSAL PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/03/1991ORDER (SEE NOTES 10 THRU 12) JB PANELTESCPR SCDATE 081991 SCHPRD VS
09/12/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR A CONSOLI- DATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLT FOR EXT TM FL BRF TO 10/15/91. NFX. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 100891 SCHPRD U
10/18/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 101891 SCHPRD K
10/18/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1991ORDER APLT MO LV FL LODGED BRF GRNTD APLE BRF DUE 11/22/91. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 103091 SCHPRD GR
11/21/1991APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AND TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHD. TO 12/27/91 PMB PANEL SCDATE 112291 SCHPRD BE
12/16/1991APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1991RECEIVED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OF APLT PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/26/1991RECEIVED APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1992APPELLANT'S BRIEF (SUPPLEMENTAL) EVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1992APPELEE'S BRIEF EVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1992ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 13-16. EVH PANELRO SCDATE 120691 SCHPRD TT
01/17/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (COPIES OF MOS TO RECUSE FROM TRL CRT) EVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1992BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/18/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/18/1992ARGUED (RG KG KN) Lawrence M. Baskir, Esq. for appellant; G. Bradley Weinsheimer, Esq. for appellee.
09/18/1992REMANDED Order RM cause for further proceedings before another judge with new counsel appointed to represent appellant. (RG KG KN)
09/29/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY FURTHER PROCEEDINGS
10/16/1992VOTE SHEET aplt's motion to stay further proceedings & request to clarify opinion
11/04/1992 Grant appellant's motion to stay further proceedings to the extent that present counsel shall, if hechooses have fourteen days from the date of this order to file a petition pursuant to Rule 40 of this court. Any Rule 41 proceedings in this court and any further proceedings in the trial court are to be handled by new counsel appointed by this court or the trial court, respectively. (ROKGKN)
11/12/1992APLT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC
02/05/1993ORD DENY APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC (Associate Judges Terry and Farrell have recused themselves from this case.) (EB)
04/05/1993MANDATE ISSUED